+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.548
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Notice Of Committee Consideration - Requested
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Vote
April 11, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 19