+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommit, Enacting Clause Stricken
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On February 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.145
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
February 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
February 6, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor