+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.234
On August 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.136
- Substituted For A3824
On May 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.504
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
March 22, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor