+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On March 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 25, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.704
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On May 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3502a
- Amend And Recommit To Investigations And Government Operations
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
May 15, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor