+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.139
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.228
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
March 21, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
February 2, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16
May 5, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 10, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor