+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 3479a
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.112
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.373
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Education
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Votes (4)
February 27, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 4
January 9, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
June 5, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1