+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On February 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On February 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.399
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
On June 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1021
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3471a
- Amend And Recommit To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (4)
February 26, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 2
February 11, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 9
June 11, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 9