+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recommitted To Rules
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1227
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.386
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 9, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor