+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.161
On August 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.317
- Substituted For A5462
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.765
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
May 19, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor