+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1165
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Health
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 2
May 12, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor