+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1259
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3385a
- Amend And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Environmental Conservation
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Vote
May 15, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor