+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1231
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3381a
- Amend And Recommit To Higher Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.890
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (5)
May 15, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 37
May 1, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 18
June 7, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 37
April 25, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor