+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On April 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.301
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Votes (2)
April 26, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 4
March 1, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor