+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1919
- Referred To Rules
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1446
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Votes (5)
June 19, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 19, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 11
June 5, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
June 5, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor