+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Votes (2)
February 12, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
May 1, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor