+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.353
On January 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3362a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On May 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.471
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
March 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16
May 12, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
April 28, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor