+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.305
On December 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.449
- Substituted For A7413
On May 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 3353b
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 3353a
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.209
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
March 9, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7