+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.982
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3345a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1484
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (5)
May 24, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 3
June 11, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
June 9, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor