+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 16, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On May 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.225
On January 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor