+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1546
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.710
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Votes (3)
June 6, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 5, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
May 2, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor