+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On March 4, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.522
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 15, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.362
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (3)
February 27, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
March 15, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 3
February 14, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor