+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1709
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1443
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
June 12, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 12, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
June 5, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor