+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 28, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 27, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 26, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.493
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 6, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On June 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 27, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.372
On January 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Votes (3)
February 26, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
June 6, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 1
February 14, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor