+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 3193a
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.383
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1449
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
May 3, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 3
March 15, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 2
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
June 10, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor