+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On August 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.344
On July 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.32
- Substituted For A5848
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.357
- Committed To Rules
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.357
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (3)
February 22, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
February 22, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
February 9, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor