+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 25, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to aging
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Reported and committed to finance
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Print number 314a
- Amend (t) and recommit to aging
On January 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to aging
+ − Votes (2)
March 25, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Aging - Mar 25, 2014
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 1
Details:
+
−
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- James Sanders Jr.: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: nay
February 28, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Aging - Feb 28, 2013
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- Joseph P. Addabbo Jr.: yea
- Tony Avella: yea
- Ruben Diaz: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Kathleen A. Marchione: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- David J. Valesky: yea
- Lee M. Zeldin: nay
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor