+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On February 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.75
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.369
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Votes (4)
February 24, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
January 26, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 13
June 1, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
April 22, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 13