+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Budget And Revenue
On November 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 31b
- Amend And Recommit To Budget And Revenue
On October 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amend By Restoring To Original Print 31
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 31a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Budget And Revenue
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Budget And Revenue