+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On February 12, 2024 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 7, 2024 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 6, 2024 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.365
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 3, 2024 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 30, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On March 29, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.453
On January 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (3)
February 6, 2024: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 7
March 29, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 18
- Present/NV: 1
March 8, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor