+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.920
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3059a
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1868
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (6)
May 7, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 1, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
January 29, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13
June 19, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
March 6, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor