+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1605
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.985
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Votes (6)
June 9, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Absent: 1
June 9, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 28, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 5
May 27, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
May 11, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7