+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.307
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.865
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Votes (4)
April 30, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 4
January 29, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 13
June 7, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor