+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.654
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
On May 11, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.863
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 3020a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Codes
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
April 26, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
March 7, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 13
May 11, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 3, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor