+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (18)
On May 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.687
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
On June 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1269
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (6)
May 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 3
May 4, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 4
April 5, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
June 10, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
June 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor