+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 15, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.123
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.441
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation
+ − Votes (4)
January 22, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
January 14, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation)
- Yeas: 7
May 6, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Cultural Affairs, Tourism, Parks And Recreation)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor