+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2996a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Health
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
March 10, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 21, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15