+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.111
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On May 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.371
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (3)
January 9, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
May 3, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
- Absent: 1
March 7, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor