+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.777
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.749
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
May 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor