+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.708
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Children And Families
+ − Vote
May 2, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Children And Families)
- Yeas: 7