+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1034
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1206
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (4)
June 1, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
May 23, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
June 9, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 2, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 18