+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On June 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.975
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2964b
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On May 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.983
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2964a
- Amend And Recommit To Codes
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
June 7, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
May 28, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 5
May 27, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1