+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1098
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2962b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2962a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
May 9, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (47)
Type:
Primary Sponsor