+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On September 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.242
On September 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.252
- Substituted For A4085a
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 2957a
On March 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On March 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.225
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (3)
June 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
March 30, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
March 10, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 16