+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 2949a
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.187
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
February 27, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2