+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Correction
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1947
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2949a
- Amend And Recommit To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (4)
February 13, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 13
June 19, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 16, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor