+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 8, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
On June 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committed to rules
On June 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On June 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.1123
On January 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to health
+ − Vote
June 4, 2013: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Health - Jun 4, 2013
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
Details:
+
−
- Eric Adams: yea
- Greg Ball: yea
- Hugh T. Farley: yea
- Simcha Felder: yea
- Charles J. Fuschillo, Jr.: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Kemp Hannon: yea
- Ruth Hassell-Thompson: yea
- Brad Hoylman-Sigal: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Velmanette Montgomery: nay
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- Gustavo Rivera: yea
- Diane J. Savino: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Catharine Young: yea