+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On December 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.132
On December 12, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.863
- Substituted For A4047b
On June 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On June 9, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Housing
On May 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 2943b
On May 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.746
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Print Number 2943a
- Amend And Recommit To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Reference Changed To Housing, Construction And Community Development
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities 1
+ − Votes (2)
June 9, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 39
- Nays: 24
May 1, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor