+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.658
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities
+ − Vote
April 26, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Mental Health And Developmental Disabilities)
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor