+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A2573a
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 294a
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.522
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
March 9, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor