+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.179
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1348
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Banks
+ − Votes (2)
January 17, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Banks)
- Yeas: 19
May 24, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Banks)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor